TX HB3807 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the option of providing electronic recordings of proceedings in the municipal court of record for the City of Houston.
Title
Relating to the option of providing electronic recordings of proceedings in the municipal court of record for the City of Houston.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-05-11 | Read first time | |
2011-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-04 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-04 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-04 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-15 | Filed |