TX HB3802 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requirements for public drinking water supply systems and certain rates and fees charged by water supply corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requirements for public drinking water supply systems and certain rates and fees charged by water supply corporations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-20SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1090
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-23HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2021-03-23HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1676 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3802
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03802I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03802H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03802E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03802S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03802I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03802H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03802H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03802E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03802E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3802&RcdVtNo=1090&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback