TX HB3786 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eligibility for community supervision of defendants convicted of certain burglary offenses.
Title
Relating to eligibility for community supervision of defendants convicted of certain burglary offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BURGLARY
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3786 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03786I.htm |