TX HB3772 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the criminal consequences of certain criminal offenses involving the possession of marihuana or possession of drug paraphernalia; imposing a fee; authorizing a fine.
Title
Relating to the criminal consequences of certain criminal offenses involving the possession of marihuana or possession of drug paraphernalia; imposing a fee; authorizing a fine.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1175 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Courts
Courts--General
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
MARIHUANA
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Courts--General
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
MARIHUANA
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF