TX HB3769 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 45-2)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to improper relationships between educators and students and reporting of educator misconduct; creating a criminal offense and expanding the applicability of an existing offense; authorizing an administrative penalty.
Title
Relating to improper relationships between educators and students and reporting of educator misconduct; creating a criminal offense and expanding the applicability of an existing offense; authorizing an administrative penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2017-04-12 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-27 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2017-03-27 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL MISCONDUCT
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL MISCONDUCT