TX HB3769 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 44-3)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to improper relationships between educators and students and reporting of educator misconduct; creating a criminal offense and expanding the applicability of an existing offense; authorizing an administrative penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to improper relationships between educators and students and reporting of educator misconduct; creating a criminal offense and expanding the applicability of an existing offense; authorizing an administrative penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2017-05-08HouseCompanion considered in lieu of
2017-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseRecalled from subcommittee
2017-04-12HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-27HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2017-03-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2017-03-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in s/c
2017-03-27HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2017-03-27HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2017-03-21HouseReferred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-03-21HouseRead first time
2017-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback