TX HB3759 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requiring each state agency to post on the agency's Internet website information on suicide prevention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requiring each state agency to post on the agency's Internet website information on suicide prevention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1090
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-10HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback