TX HB3746 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain notifications required following a breach of security of computerized data.
Title
Relating to certain notifications required following a breach of security of computerized data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#555 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#555 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#555 |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-28 | House | Amended 1-Stucky |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Consumer Protection
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Protection of Personal Information
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Consumer Protection
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Protection of Personal Information