TX HB374 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to meetings or visits between a defendant on community supervision and a supervision officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to meetings or visits between a defendant on community supervision and a supervision officer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1342 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#124 (Y: 142 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-13SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-10HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-10HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1342
2019-05-10HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-01HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-01HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-01HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-01SenateRecord vote
2019-05-01SenatePassed
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenateRecord vote
2019-05-01SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-01SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-29SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-04-04SenateRead first time
2019-04-03SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-02HouseRecord vote RV#124
2019-04-02HousePassed
2019-04-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-01HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Corrections
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1248 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback