TX HB3646 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Summary
Relating to public school finance and programs.
Title
Relating to public school finance and programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | See remarks for effective date | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | House adopts resolution for tech. correction | |
2009-06-01 | Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction | |
2009-06-01 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-06-01 | Record vote | |
2009-06-01 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-06-01 | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2009-06-01 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-31 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2009-05-31 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Remarks ordered printed | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment tabled | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment tabled | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment fails of adoption | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Motion to table fails | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Motion to table fails | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-26 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-26 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2009-05-25 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2009-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Education | |
2009-05-14 | Read first time | |
2009-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-13 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed as amended | |
2009-05-12 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-12 | Vote reconsidered | |
2009-05-12 | Amended | |
2009-05-12 | Amended | |
2009-05-12 | Amended | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-11 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-11 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-11 | Vote reconsidered | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-11 | Record vote | |
2009-05-11 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-11 | Amendment tabled | |
2009-05-11 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | |
2009-05-11 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-11 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-11 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-08 | Calendars Committee rule adopted | |
2009-05-07 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-01 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-01 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-05-01 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Public Education | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
Taxation
Taxation--School District
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
Taxation
Taxation--School District