TX HB3629 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorization by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board for the Brazosport College District to offer a baccalaureate degree program in nursing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorization by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board for the Brazosport College District to offer a baccalaureate degree program in nursing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1083 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-18SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-18HousePosting rule suspended
2017-03-29HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-29HouseRead first time
2017-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback