TX HB3613 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 40-14)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 40-14)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Summary
Relating to the determination of the market value of a residence homestead for ad valorem tax purposes on the basis of the property's value as a residence homestead and to an exemption from ad valorem taxation of the residence homesteads of certain totally disabled veterans and to the amount of the exemption from ad valorem taxation to which a disabled veteran is entitled based on disability rating.
Title
Relating to the determination of the market value of a residence homestead for ad valorem tax purposes on the basis of the property's value as a residence homestead and to an exemption from ad valorem taxation of the residence homesteads of certain totally disabled veterans and to the amount of the exemption from ad valorem taxation to which a disabled veteran is entitled based on disability rating.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | See remarks for effective date | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | House adopts resolution for tech. correction | |
2009-06-01 | Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction | |
2009-05-28 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2009-05-28 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-27 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-27 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-26 | Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-25 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-25 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Passed | |
2009-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-25 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-25 | Amended | |
2009-05-25 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-25 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-27 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-09 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-02 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR36 (Enabling for) 2009-06-03 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts