TX HB3609 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administrative and civil consequences imposed by the Department of Public Safety.
Title
Relating to the administrative and civil consequences imposed by the Department of Public Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-05 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3609 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03609I.htm |