TX HB3599 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the operation of certain three-wheeled vehicles in this state.
Title
Relating to the operation of certain three-wheeled vehicles in this state.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Brown [R] | Sen. Rodney Ellis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-27 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-29 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-28 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-22 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2361 (Same As) 2009-03-31 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.