TX HB355 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to providing notice to a state representative and senator of an administrative penalty assessed by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Title
Relating to providing notice to a state representative and senator of an administrative penalty assessed by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. Nicole Collier [D] |
Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-30 - House - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#582 |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-21 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |