TX HB3538 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to post-discharge services offered by a juvenile board or juvenile probation department to a child after the child's probation period ends.
Title
Relating to post-discharge services offered by a juvenile board or juvenile probation department to a child after the child's probation period ends.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Human Services
Human Services--General
Juvenile Boards & Officers
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Human Services
Human Services--General
Juvenile Boards & Officers
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice