TX HB3511 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Commission on Texas Workforce of the Future.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Commission on Texas Workforce of the Future.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1233 (Y: 116 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1164 (Y: 118 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-22HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenatePassed
2019-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-20SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-13SenateReferred to Education
2019-05-13SenateRead first time
2019-05-09SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1233
2019-05-09HousePassed
2019-05-09HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Gutierrez
2019-05-09HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2019-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1164
2019-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-08HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2019-03-18HouseRead first time
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3511
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03511I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03511H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03511E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03511S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03511F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3511&RcdVtNo=1164&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3511&RcdVtNo=1233&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=149
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=150

Bill Comments

feedback