TX HB3505 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment and administration of a state bullion depository and the investment of certain public money in precious metals and depository accounts.
Title
Relating to the establishment and administration of a state bullion depository and the investment of certain public money in precious metals and depository accounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BANKING, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
COINS & PRECIOUS METALS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Electronic Information Systems
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TEXAS BULLION DEPOSITORY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER
COINS & PRECIOUS METALS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Electronic Information Systems
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TEXAS BULLION DEPOSITORY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB3505 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB03505I.htm |