TX HB3481 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Summary
Relating to the expunction of records and files relating to a person's arrest.
Title
Relating to the expunction of records and files relating to a person's arrest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-30 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-23 | Record vote | |
2009-05-23 | Passed | |
2009-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-23 | Record vote | |
2009-05-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-23 | Amended | |
2009-05-23 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-23 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-19 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-07 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-06 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-06 | Record vote | |
2009-05-06 | Passed | |
2009-05-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-27 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-17 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB920 (Same As) 2009-04-27 - Not again placed on intent calendar