TX HB3478 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of and the requirements for obtaining certain driver's licenses or identification certificates; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the issuance of and the requirements for obtaining certain driver's licenses or identification certificates; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-04-10 | House | Correction in referral |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3478 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03478I.htm |