TX HB3474 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation and administration of and practices and procedures regarding proceedings in the judicial branch of state government, including the service of process and delivery of documents related to the proceedings, the administration of oaths, and the management of the Texas Indigent Defense Commission, and the composition of certain juvenile boards; establishing a civil penalty; increasing certain court costs; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to the operation and administration of and practices and procedures regarding proceedings in the judicial branch of state government, including the service of process and delivery of documents related to the proceedings, the administration of oaths, and the management of the Texas Indigent Defense Commission, and the composition of certain juvenile boards; establishing a civil penalty; increasing certain court costs; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Stan Gerdes [R] | Rep. Eddie Morales [D] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] |
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2251 (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-21 - Senate - FA2 Huffman (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Amended RV#793 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2251 (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-21 - Senate - FA2 Huffman (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Amended RV#793 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | See remarks for effective date | |
2023-06-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2023-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#2251 |
2023-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2023-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2023-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2023-05-25 | House | House appoints conferees |
2023-05-25 | House | House requests conference committee |
2023-05-25 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2023-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 West |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Huffman |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#793 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed as amended |
2023-05-02 | House | Amended 1-Leach |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-01 | House | Amended 3-Metcalf |
2023-05-01 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 1-Leach |
2023-05-01 | House | Amendment amended 2-Schofield |
2023-05-01 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Leach |
2023-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1462 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Jurisprudence
SB1462 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Jurisprudence
SB1462 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Subjects
ARANSAS COUNTY
BASTROP COUNTY
BEE COUNTY
BEXAR COUNTY
BRAZORIA COUNTY
BRAZOS COUNTY
CAMERON COUNTY
COLLIN COUNTY
County Government
County Government--General
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
COURT REPORTERS CERTIFICATION ADVISORY BOARD
Courts
Courts--Appellate
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--Judges
Courts--Juries
Courts--Personnel
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
Courts--Reporters
CRIMINAL APPEALS, COURT OF
DALLAS COUNTY
DENTON COUNTY
DUVAL COUNTY
EDWARDS COUNTY
EL PASO COUNTY
FORENSIC SCIENCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
GILLESPIE COUNTY
GRAYSON COUNTY
GUADALUPE COUNTY
HARRIS COUNTY
INDIGENT DEFENSE COMMISSION, TEXAS
JUDICIAL BRANCH CERTIFICATION COMMISSION
JUSTICE OF THE PEACE
Juvenile Boards & Officers
KAUFMAN COUNTY
KENDALL COUNTY
KERR COUNTY
KIMBLE COUNTY
LIVE OAK COUNTY
MAGISTRATES
MCLENNAN COUNTY
MCMULLEN COUNTY
MONTGOMERY COUNTY
OATHS
POLK COUNTY
PROCESS SERVERS
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
Salaries & Expenses
SIGN LANGUAGE & SIGN LANGUAGE INTERPRETERS
STEPHENS COUNTY
SUPREME COURT
TARRANT COUNTY
TRAVIS COUNTY
WALLER COUNTY
WILSON COUNTY
BASTROP COUNTY
BEE COUNTY
BEXAR COUNTY
BRAZORIA COUNTY
BRAZOS COUNTY
CAMERON COUNTY
COLLIN COUNTY
County Government
County Government--General
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
COURT REPORTERS CERTIFICATION ADVISORY BOARD
Courts
Courts--Appellate
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--Judges
Courts--Juries
Courts--Personnel
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
Courts--Reporters
CRIMINAL APPEALS, COURT OF
DALLAS COUNTY
DENTON COUNTY
DUVAL COUNTY
EDWARDS COUNTY
EL PASO COUNTY
FORENSIC SCIENCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
GILLESPIE COUNTY
GRAYSON COUNTY
GUADALUPE COUNTY
HARRIS COUNTY
INDIGENT DEFENSE COMMISSION, TEXAS
JUDICIAL BRANCH CERTIFICATION COMMISSION
JUSTICE OF THE PEACE
Juvenile Boards & Officers
KAUFMAN COUNTY
KENDALL COUNTY
KERR COUNTY
KIMBLE COUNTY
LIVE OAK COUNTY
MAGISTRATES
MCLENNAN COUNTY
MCMULLEN COUNTY
MONTGOMERY COUNTY
OATHS
POLK COUNTY
PROCESS SERVERS
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
Salaries & Expenses
SIGN LANGUAGE & SIGN LANGUAGE INTERPRETERS
STEPHENS COUNTY
SUPREME COURT
TARRANT COUNTY
TRAVIS COUNTY
WALLER COUNTY
WILSON COUNTY