TX HB3462 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of liaison officers to assist certain students at public institutions of higher education who are parents.
Title
Relating to the designation of liaison officers to assist certain students at public institutions of higher education who are parents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1090 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-03 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Family
Family--Parent & Child
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Family
Family--Parent & Child
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS