TX HB3457 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of certain laws to the Windham School District and teachers or administrators of the district.
Title
Relating to the applicability of certain laws to the Windham School District and teachers or administrators of the district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#417 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#417 |
2021-04-23 | House | Passed |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-07 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
WINDHAM SCHOOL DISTRICT
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
WINDHAM SCHOOL DISTRICT