TX HB3436 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use and development of state property, including real property within the Capitol complex.
Title
Relating to the use and development of state property, including real property within the Capitol complex.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - House - HB 3436Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - HB 3436Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - HB 3436Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-15 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Economic Development |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-03 | House | Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-02 | House | Amended |
2013-05-02 | House | Amended |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform |
2013-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS