TX HB3426 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality of certain information received or maintained by the Veterans' Land Board.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality of certain information received or maintained by the Veterans' Land Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |