TX HB3417 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the jurisdiction of criminal law hearing officers in Cameron County.
Title
Relating to the jurisdiction of criminal law hearing officers in Cameron County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-26 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-25 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-23 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-22 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | |
2009-05-22 | Rereferred to committee | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-14 | Read first time | |
2009-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-08 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2115 (Same As) 2009-03-31 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
CAMERON COUNTY
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--Personnel
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--Personnel