TX HB3412 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Texas Veterans County Service Officer Task Force.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Texas Veterans County Service Officer Task Force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2104 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - See remarks for effective date
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Interim Studies
Military & Veterans
SENATE, TEXAS
TEXAS VETERANS COUNTY SERVICE OFFICER TASK FORCE
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS
County Government--General
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Interim Studies
Military & Veterans
SENATE, TEXAS
TEXAS VETERANS COUNTY SERVICE OFFICER TASK FORCE
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS