TX HB3402 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to the sale of certain state property in Brazoria County by the Texas Board of Criminal Justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the sale of certain state property in Brazoria County by the Texas Board of Criminal Justice.


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]


2017-06-12 Effective immediately
2017-06-12 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-04SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-20HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-29HouseReferred to Corrections
2017-03-29HouseRead first time


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments