TX HB3381 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to creating the criminal offense of misrepresenting medical history to obtain unnecessary medical treatment for a child, elderly individual, or disabled individual.
Title
Relating to creating the criminal offense of misrepresenting medical history to obtain unnecessary medical treatment for a child, elderly individual, or disabled individual.
Sponsors
Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Craig Goldman [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Nate Schatzline [R] |
Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Public hearing continued on . . . |
2023-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aging
ALYSSA'S LAW
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Disabilities, Persons with
MEDICAL RECORDS
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
ALYSSA'S LAW
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Disabilities, Persons with
MEDICAL RECORDS
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against