TX HB3371 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-18 - Reported from s/c with no recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-18 - Reported from s/c with no recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health benefits offered by institutions of higher education to students and their families.
Title
Relating to health benefits offered by institutions of higher education to students and their families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1626 (Y: 115 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Reported from s/c with no recommendation |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | House | Record vote RV#1626 |
2023-05-12 | House | Passed |
2023-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident