TX HB3360 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Economic Incentive Oversight Board.
Title
Relating to the Economic Incentive Oversight Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#627 (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Economic & Industrial Development--Rural
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM, OFFICE OF
ECONOMIC INCENTIVE OVERSIGHT BOARD
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Economic & Industrial Development--Rural
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM, OFFICE OF
ECONOMIC INCENTIVE OVERSIGHT BOARD
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District