TX HB3345 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to health benefit coverage provided by certain health benefit plans for telemedicine medical services and telehealth services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health benefit coverage provided by certain health benefit plans for telemedicine medical services and telehealth services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1096 (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-15SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1096
2019-05-08HousePassed
2019-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-07HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-01HousePostponed 5/7/19 10:00 AM
2019-05-01HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-04-24HousePostponed 5/1/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-03-18HouseRead first time
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback