TX HB3343 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the issuance of specialty license plates to honor certain Purple Heart recipients; imposing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of specialty license plates to honor certain Purple Heart recipients; imposing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1036 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-07HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1036
2019-05-07HousePassed
2019-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-07HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-30HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2019-03-18HouseRead first time
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback