TX HB3342 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to interstate compacts and cooperative agreements relating to state purchasing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to interstate compacts and cooperative agreements relating to state purchasing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-16 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2015-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-23HouseRecord vote
2015-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2015-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2015-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2015-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2015-05-22SenateRecord vote
2015-05-22SenatePassed
2015-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-22SenateRecord vote
2015-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-06SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2015-05-06SenateRead first time
2015-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-04HouseRecord vote
2015-05-04HousePassed
2015-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-01HousePassed to engrossment
2015-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-29HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-22HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-22HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-23HouseReferred to Government Transparency & Operation
2015-03-23HouseRead first time
2015-03-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback