TX HB3337 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of certain persons to teach a driver education course.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of certain persons to teach a driver education course.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#647 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-02 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-02 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses