TX HB3319 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain measures to promote compliance with and improve public awareness of the state's move over or slow down law concerning the passing of certain vehicles.
Title
Relating to certain measures to promote compliance with and improve public awareness of the state's move over or slow down law concerning the passing of certain vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] |
Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Candy Noble [R] | Sen. Kelly Hancock [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#951 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-27 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DRIVER EDUCATION & SAFETY CLASSES
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Highways
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
Safety
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Highways
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
Safety
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road