TX HB3301 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-08 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-08 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Summary
Relating to a health passport for Medicaid recipients.
Title
Relating to a health passport for Medicaid recipients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | Companion considered in lieu of in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB286 (Same As) 2009-05-18 - Postponed
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
MEDICAL RECORDS
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
MEDICAL RECORDS