TX HB3279 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Recommitted to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Recommitted to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority and duties of the office of inspector general of the Health and Human Services Commission.
Title
Relating to the authority and duties of the office of inspector general of the Health and Human Services Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Recommitted to committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-04-22 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-22 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-04-15 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-15 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-04-08 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2015-04-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
AUDITS & AUDITORS
FRAUD
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Human Services--Food Programs
Human Services--General
Human Services--Medical Assistance
INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills
AUDITS & AUDITORS
FRAUD
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Human Services--Food Programs
Human Services--General
Human Services--Medical Assistance
INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB3279 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB03279I.htm |