TX HB3278 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to membership of the commissioner of education and the Texas Education Agency in certain advisory committees, commissions, task forces, and other similar entities.
Title
Relating to membership of the commissioner of education and the Texas Education Agency in certain advisory committees, commissions, task forces, and other similar entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-25 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-17 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Education | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
ASSISTIVE & REHABILITATIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions