TX HB3278 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the creation, organization, governance, duties, and functions of the Texas Department of Vehicles; providing a penalty.
Title
Relating to the creation, organization, governance, duties, and functions of the Texas Department of Vehicles; providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB626 (Same As) 2009-05-07 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF