TX HB327 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a public law school in El Paso County.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a public law school in El Paso County.
Sponsors
Rep. Lina Ortega [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Rep. Art Fierro [D] |
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB144 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Referred to Higher Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
EL PASO COUNTY
EL PASO SCHOOL OF LAW
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
EL PASO COUNTY
EL PASO SCHOOL OF LAW
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM