TX HB327 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-07 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-07 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study on the availability of information regarding convictions and deferred dispositions for certain fine-only misdemeanors.
Title
Relating to a study on the availability of information regarding convictions and deferred dispositions for certain fine-only misdemeanors.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - House - HB 327Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-05 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-05 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-22 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Interim Studies
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Interim Studies
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF