TX HB3257 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation and inspection of boilers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation and inspection of boilers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1599 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Effective immediately
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-22HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-20HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-20HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-19HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-18SenateRecord vote
2017-05-18SenatePassed
2017-05-18SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-18SenateRecord vote
2017-05-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18SenateAmended
2017-05-18SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-18SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-20HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-20HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-18HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-13HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-28HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2017-03-28HouseRead first time
2017-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback