TX HB3246 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-29 - House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-29 - House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public improvement districts designated by a municipality or county.
Title
Relating to public improvement districts designated by a municipality or county.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Elkins [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-29 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | S. refuses to adopt conf comm rept.-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | Motion fails | |
2011-05-29 | Motion to adopt conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-28 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-27 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Amended | |
2011-05-25 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-19 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-18 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-05-05 | Read first time | |
2011-05-04 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-03 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-03 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-03 | Amended | |
2011-05-03 | Amended | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-29 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-28 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-13 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2011-04-13 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous