TX HB3226 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a temporary health insurance risk pool.
Title
Relating to the creation of a temporary health insurance risk pool.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#592 (Y: 132 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - Read 2nd time RV#573 (Y: 128 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - Read 2nd time RV#573 (Y: 128 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed |
2017-05-02 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2017-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |