TX HB3225 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to elections held by the Panhandle Groundwater Conservation District.
Title
Relating to elections held by the Panhandle Groundwater Conservation District.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-19 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-12 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-18 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2017-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-14 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--General
PANHANDLE GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Elections--General
PANHANDLE GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3225 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03225I.htm |