TX HB3218 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of abortion, including information regarding perinatal palliative care and prohibiting discriminatory abortions; authorizing disciplinary action; providing a civil remedy; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the regulation of abortion, including information regarding perinatal palliative care and prohibiting discriminatory abortions; authorizing disciplinary action; providing a civil remedy; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Schaefer [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] | Rep. Charles Anderson [R] |
Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R] | Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] |
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Rep. Jeff Cason [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] |
Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Sam Harless [R] | Rep. Cody Harris [R] |
Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Rep. Justin Holland [R] | Rep. Lacey Hull [R] | Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] |
Rep. Ken King [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. Stephanie Klick [R] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] |
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Ben Leman [R] | Rep. William Metcalf [R] | Sen. Mayes Middleton [R] |
Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Jared Patterson [R] | Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
Rep. Scott Sanford [R] | Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. Bryan Slaton [R] | Rep. Shelby Slawson [R] |
Rep. David Spiller [R] | Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] |
Rep. Ed Thompson [R] | Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R] | Rep. Steve Toth [R] | Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R] |
Rep. Cody Vasut [R] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Terry Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1173 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Abortion
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
PREBORN NONDISCRIMINATION ACT
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
PREBORN NONDISCRIMINATION ACT
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF