TX HB3216 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to electronic communication between property owners and chief appraisers, appraisal districts, appraisal review boards, or any combination of those persons.
Title
Relating to electronic communication between property owners and chief appraisers, appraisal districts, appraisal review boards, or any combination of those persons.
Sponsors
Rep. John Otto [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-25 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-20 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-05-12 | Read first time | |
2011-05-12 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-11 | Record vote | |
2011-05-11 | Passed | |
2011-05-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-11 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-11 | Amended | |
2011-05-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-04 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-28 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-25 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-04-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Electronic Information Systems
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
PUBLIC NOTICE
REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Electronic Information Systems
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
PUBLIC NOTICE
REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts