TX HB3212 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to newborn screening tests.
Title
Relating to newborn screening tests.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Toth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BIRTHING CENTERS
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
MALLORI'S ACT
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PARENTAL NOTIFICATION
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
MALLORI'S ACT
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PARENTAL NOTIFICATION
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF