TX HB3202 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to access by the Texas Education Agency and private schools to certain criminal history records.
Title
Relating to access by the Texas Education Agency and private schools to certain criminal history records.
Sponsors
Rep. Candy Noble [R] | Rep. Armando Walle [D] | Rep. Terry Wilson [R] | Rep. Cole Hefner [R] |
Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] | Rep. Matt Schaefer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1471 (Same As) 2023-06-18 - Effective immediately
SB1471 (Same As) 2023-06-18 - Effective immediately
SB1471 (Same As) 2023-06-18 - Effective immediately
Subjects
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF